Northern territory cabinet ministers
WebThe Cabinet Handbook outlines the underlying principles of Cabinet, government and general expectations for Cabinet business and meetings, with detailed requirements and … WebHe was succeeded on 13 August 1977 by Paul Everingham (CLP) as Majority Leader. When the Territory attained self-government on 1 July 1978, Everingham became chief …
Northern territory cabinet ministers
Did you know?
WebD. Hon Yvette D'Ath Member for Redcliffe (ALP) Minister for Health and Ambulance Services. Hon Michael (Mick) de Brenni Member for Springwood (ALP) Minister for Energy, Renewables and Hydrogen and Minister for Public Works and Procurement. Hon Cameron Dick Member for Woodridge (ALP) Treasurer and Minister for Trade and Investment.
Web20 de out. de 2024 · The office: Provides operational and secretariat services to the Northern Territory Cabinet, Cabinet Sub-Committees, the Executive Council and the Remuneration Tribunal. WebNORTHERN TERRITORY CABINET RECORDS 1983 CABINET-IN-CONFIDENCE – EMBARGOED UNTIL 1/1/2014 Page 1 Volume 118A Meeting date: 18 January 1983 MEETING NO. MEETING DATE SUB NO. ... MINISTERS AND MINISTERIAL STAFF TRAVEL To present to Cabinet at the beginning of each month an Information paper on …
WebCabinet. The Canadian Ministry ( download the list in PDF) is commonly referred to as Cabinet. It is the body of ministerial advisors that sets the federal government’s policies and priorities for the country. Sorting Options. Apply. Web1 de dez. de 2024 · This page has copies of the Department of Chief Minister and Cabinet Annual Reports. Annual Report 2024-22 Annual Report PDF (5.2 MB) 2024-21 Annual …
WebLabor Governments and Women Labor Party History Labor Prime Ministers Since 1970s. Donate. Our Plan. Our People. ... Cabinet Secretary . sm. Justine Elliot . Member for Richmond . all,mp. Cassandra Fernando ... Senator for the Northern Territory . all,sen. Deborah O'Neill . Senator for New South Wales . all,sen.
Web31 de ago. de 2024 · Minister responsible for the Federal Economic Development Agency for Northern Ontario Thunder Bay—Superior North Ontario The Honourable François-Philippe Champagne Minister of Innovation, Science and Industry Saint-Maurice—Champlain Quebec The Honourable Karina Gould Minister of Families, … culver burgers near meWebThe deputy chief minister is almost always the deputy leader of the governing party. The incumbent deputy chief minister of the Northern Territory is Nicole Manison. Manison … culver cadet ownersWebMinisters' portfolios. Premier, Deputy Premier, MLA. Cabinet Premier Ranj Pillai MLA – Porter Creek South Premier Minister of the Executive Council Office Minister responsible for Yukon Housing Corporation Minister of Economic Development See Premier Ranj Pillai's Yukon Legislative Assembly profile. east moon asian bistro \u0026 sushiWebMinister for Northern Australia The Hon Madeleine King MP. Minister for Agriculture, Fisheries and Forestry Minister for Emergency Management Senator the Hon Murray … east moon chinese barbadosWeb23 de mai. de 2024 · The Northern Territory Government's new cabinet has been chosen, with former energy minister Eva Lawler named as Treasurer, and Chief Minister Natasha … east moon longmont coloradoWeb13 de mai. de 2024 · Natasha Fyles has become the Northern Territory’s 12th Chief Minister after the shock resignation of Michael Gunner earlier this week. Key points: … east moon asian bistro glen burnie happy hourWeb23 de jul. de 2024 · The Ministers. Whether during session of the Legislative Assembly or other times of the year, the Executive Council is responsible for the day-to-day … east monument and north montford